Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cecil, Balram, Cecil, Rawatee, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Moises, Jesus David, Quintana, Carolina Maria, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Henn, Joseph Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Request for Production
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 28, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 28, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: June 18, 2021Certificate of Compliance
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 30, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 05, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 12, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 06, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 17, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: September 17, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 17, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: October 05, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 07, 2021Case Management Order
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: October 18, 2021Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: January 04, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: June 23, 2022Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: January 26, 2022Request for Production
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: June 23, 2022Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: June 23, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: June 23, 2022Expert Interrogatories
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 22, 2022Witness & Exhibit List
Date: June 23, 2022Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 22, 2022Request for Production
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 01, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: September 07, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: September 07, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: September 07, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 13, 2022Request for Production
Date: October 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 14, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 14, 2022Order Resetting
Date: October 19, 2022Agreed Order
Date: October 24, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 18, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: October 19, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: November 10, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 17, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: November 08, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: November 10, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: December 08, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: January 06, 2023Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: January 18, 2023Agreed Order
Date: January 12, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: January 19, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: January 25, 2023Mediation Report
Date: January 19, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 27, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: January 27, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 07, 2023Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: February 08, 2023Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 10, 2023Motion in Limine
Date: February 15, 2023Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: February 15, 2023Mediation Report
Date: February 11, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: March 01, 2023Notice of Withdrawal
Date: February 23, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: September 17, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: March 15, 2022Request for Production
Date: May 28, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY DOCUMENTS CLAIMED AS PRIVILEGEDParty: Plaintiff Cecil, Rawatee Plaintiff Cecil, Balram |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Expert Witness AND FOR SANCTIONSParty: Plaintiff Cecil, Rawatee Plaintiff Cecil, Balram |
|
February 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Mediation 02/10/23 1:30 PM |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference https://17thllcourts.zoom.us/j/111475745 of the Broward County Courthouse, 201 SE 6th Street, Ft Lauerdale, FL 33301 on 02-16-2023 9:15 AM |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Compel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.