Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Marques, Maria, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac, against 7 Eleven, Inc., Mdc Coast 5, Llc,, represented by Ieraci, Daniel F, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBowman, John B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Case Management Order
Date: June 30, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 01, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 08, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 05, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: July 26, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: July 26, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 05, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 05, 2021Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 05, 2021Request to Produce
Date: August 05, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 10, 2021Request to Produce
Date: August 10, 2021Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: August 10, 2021Denial of Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 10, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: December 17, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: September 09, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: September 13, 2021Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: September 17, 2021Joint Motion
Date: October 11, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 28, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 11, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 28, 2021Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: December 14, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 08, 2021Witness List
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 03, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 04, 2022Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: February 04, 2022Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: February 07, 2022Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: March 04, 2022Certificate
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: February 08, 2022Motion
Date: April 19, 2022Agreed Order
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: April 09, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 08, 2022Motion
Date: July 14, 2022Notice of Service
Date: March 18, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 03, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: May 05, 2022Order Resetting
Date: April 07, 2022Order Granting Motion
Date: June 28, 2022Stipulation
Date: August 04, 2022Final Disposition Form
Date: August 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR FINAL ORDER |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND COMPEL EXECUTION OF RELEASEParty: Defendant 7 Eleven, Inc. |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion FOR EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR EOUITABLE DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT PKOCEEDS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 768.76(5) AND (6) *HIC ARE APPLICABLE TO STATUTORY LIENS AND LETTERS OF PROTECTION ANRMOTION TO DISAUOW PAYMENT OF ASSIGNENT OF BENEFITS OR DOCTORS LETTER OF PROTECTION NOT EXfiJTED BY THE UNDERSIGNED ATTORNEYS OFFICE |
|
April 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting trial |
|
April 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGEMNTParty: Defendant 7 Eleven, Inc. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.