Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Levy, Glenford, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Singer, Thomas A, against American Security Insurance Company, represented by Batista, David O, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: May 28, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF DESIGNATION OF APPRAISERParty: Plaintiff Levy, Glenford |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTSParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel APPRAISAL AND STAY PROCEEDINGSParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO None |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.