Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hidalgo, Irma, Hidalgo, Juan, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Aguila, Carlos Christian, Urbano, Dennis Nicholas, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Golovin, Jeffrey W, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 28, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 29, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: June 29, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 29, 2021Order Setting
Date: August 04, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: August 19, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 07, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: October 23, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: October 26, 2021Notice
Date: October 29, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 28, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 28, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 14, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 01, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 14, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: June 15, 2021Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 23, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: July 23, 2021Notice of Jury Trial
Date: August 04, 2021Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 23, 2021Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 18, 2021Case Management Order
Date: October 18, 2021Certificate
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: October 21, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 21, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: October 21, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 25, 2021Agreed Order
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 01, 2021Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ACCEPTANCE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Hidalgo, Irma Plaintiff Hidalgo, Juan |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Motion for Protective Order |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Juan Hidalgo Irma Hidalgo 01/28/21 |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Frank Marchante, January 20,2022 at 1 PM |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.