Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mian, Mohammad, Mian, Nabella, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Ciani, Nicholas Peter, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Rothell, Kristi Bergemann, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Filing
Date: October 13, 2022Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: October 11, 2022Amended
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served on the 22nd day of August, 2022 at 10:20 am, IParty: Attorney Rothell, Kristi Bergemann |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served on the 22nd day of August, 2022 at 2:05 pmParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended EXPERT WITNESS LISTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Objection TO PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LISTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Objection TO PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LISTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.