Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Accuray Incorporated, Tomotherapy Incorporated, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Batta, Ravi, Esq., against Care Lg 2016 Holdings Llc, represented by Adams, Marshall A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOlefson, Shari Africk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Order Granting Motion
Date: June 03, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: June 04, 2021Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: March 07, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 21, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: June 25, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: December 09, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: May 28, 2021Ex Parte Motion
Date: June 02, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: August 11, 2021eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: June 04, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: January 10, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 13, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: August 22, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: May 02, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: July 13, 2021Case Management Order
Date: March 05, 2022Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 14, 2021Agreed Order Granting
Date: August 12, 2021Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 09, 2023Case Management Order
Date: October 14, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: November 29, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: July 13, 2022Case Management Order
Date: November 05, 2021Order
Date: May 10, 2023Order Granting
Date: November 05, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: November 09, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: December 20, 2021Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: January 07, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 13, 2022Response to Motion for Judgment
Date: August 09, 2022Case Management Order
Date: November 29, 2022Second Amended Complaint
Date: February 11, 2022Case Management Order
Date: January 13, 2022Order Extending Time
Date: March 03, 2022Case Management Order
Date: April 08, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: June 02, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: June 17, 2022Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: July 10, 2023Motion for Clarification
Date: July 07, 20234th DCA Order
Date: October 03, 2023Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of:
Date: July 27, 2023Order
Date: July 20, 2023Compliance
Date: July 21, 2023Appeal Record Completed
Date: July 27, 20234th DCA Order
Date: August 09, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 14, 2022Motion for Judgment on Pleadings
Date: June 13, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 21, 2022Case Management Order
Date: June 09, 2022Case Management Order
Date: August 11, 2022Order Granting Motion
Date: August 19, 2022Response to Motion
Date: August 05, 2022Case Management Order
Date: September 29, 2022Motion for Leave
Date: November 30, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: October 07, 2022Motion for Rehearing
Date: May 25, 2023Court Ord/No Trial Set
Date: October 24, 2022Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: August 31, 2022Case Management Order
Date: October 20, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 25, 2022Response to Motion
Date: December 09, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 17, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: November 30, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 21, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: December 13, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 18, 2023Case Management Order
Date: April 27, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 26, 2023Order Granting
Date: December 29, 2022Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 13, 2023Acknowledgment
Date: June 26, 2023Response to Motion
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: June 01, 20234th DCA Order
Date: June 29, 2023Order Denying Motion
Date: June 06, 2023Notice of Appeal
Date: June 08, 20234th DCA Order
Date: June 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order Pursuant to the October 2,2023 notice of voluntary dismissal, this appeal is dismissed |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D23-1417; KH/ ORDERED that appellants' August 8, 2023 motion for clarification is granted |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal Record Transmitted to 4DCA 4D231417 |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of: 4D23-1417 $203.00 // E-Mailed to Appellant Atty |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal Record Completed 4D23-1417 // E-Mailed to All Parties |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Compliance NOTICE OF WITH COURT'S DIRECTIONS AND JULY 20,2023 ORDERParty: Plaintiff Accuray Incorporated |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Referring Case to Mediation | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Clarification REGARDING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.