Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Garofalo, Fred, Tomor, Veronica, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Santiago, Maximo A, Santiago, Maximo Alexander, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Jahangir, Farheen, Qiu, Mengjun "Kristy", in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaury, William W., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Witness List
Date: May 15, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 22, 2023Order Extending Time
Date: June 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Tomor, Veronica Plaintiff Garofalo, Fred |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Produce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.