Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Belvin, James, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Takiff, Michael S, Esq., against Florida Family Insurance Company, represented by Reising, Nicholas J, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Casey, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCasey, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order The trial period for the May 4,2023 Calendar Call is 1May 8 to 1May 26,2023 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Florida Family Insurance Company |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Setting | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order MONDAY, DECEMBER 5,2022 AT 8:45 AM |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Status Conference THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 3,2022 AT 8:45 AM VIA DIVISION 03 ZOOM |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order held in Courtroom 15155 or Zoom: https://17thflcourts.zoom.us/j/135647283 on 10-14- 2022 8:30 AM |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.