Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Loy Kevin, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Mister Car Wash, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with KATHRYN C JACOBUS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHRYN C JACOBUS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34032783
Date: September 29, 2021SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED Event Code 7652-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33677089
Date: July 07, 2021SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2721-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33588279
Date: June 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | ||
December 07, 2022 | LACK OF PROSECUTION ELIGIBLE Event Code 5560-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 01, 2022 | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | ||
September 29, 2021 | DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34032783 | ||
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Event Code 3932-Event Seq 1 | |
September 08, 2021 | CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR Event Code 4395-Event Seq 2 | ||
July 07, 2021 | SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED Event Code 7652-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33677089 | ||
July 05, 2021 | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | ||
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2721-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33588279 | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.