Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Teele Shelia M, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Teele Bryan James, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with DAVID C KOENIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID C KOENIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33969771
Date: September 13, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 33910874
Date: August 31, 2021REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33943960
Date: September 08, 2021COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 33910883
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | ||
March 30, 2023 | LACK OF PROSECUTION ELIGIBLE Event Code 5560-Event Seq 1 | ||
September 13, 2021 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33969771 | ||
September 08, 2021 | REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33943960 | ||
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 33910874 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 33910883 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION Event Code 5740-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 33910878 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ASM: ENVELOPE AND POSTAGE Event Code 10874-Event Seq 3 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 4 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS Event Code 9568-Event Seq 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.