Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
J B Summerset Apartments Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Fisher Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with THOMAS JAMES BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTHOMAS JAMES BROWN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Event Code 6143-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33999694
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33991910
Date: September 17, 2021REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34309478
Date: December 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2022 | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | ||
December 03, 2021 | REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34309478 | ||
October 13, 2021 | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34108458 | ||
October 13, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2 | ||
September 22, 2021 | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Event Code 6143-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33999694 | ||
September 22, 2021 | F/J FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW Event Code 10635-Event Seq 1 | ||
September 17, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33991910 | ||
September 17, 2021 | LANDLORD CARES ACT INFO SHEET Event Code 11928-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33991907 | ||
September 17, 2021 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 33991911 | ||
September 17, 2021 | REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33982680 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.