Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Madalyn Landing, Wrh Madalyn Landing Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Barrett Charles V, against Lang Alyson M, Rentfrow Tyler D, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with THOMAS JAMES BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTHOMAS JAMES BROWN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2022 | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 11822-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 35307371 | ||
July 27, 2022 | ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 27, 2022 | CLOSURE VACATED-CASE DISPOSED Event Code 11663-Event Seq 3 | ||
July 01, 2022 | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | ||
June 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 35100838 | ||
June 14, 2022 | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | ||
June 14, 2022 | CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2 | ||
June 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35091675 | ||
May 17, 2022 | CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2 | ||
May 17, 2022 | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.