Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ocean Breeze Property Holdings Apartments Llc, Park Via Terrossa, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Barrett Charles V, Barrett Charles V 4, against Gagne Sara A, Neal Glennis B, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with KELLY INGRAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY INGRAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 34097946 | ||
October 11, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 07, 2021 | REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33677127 | ||
July 05, 2021 | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | ||
June 29, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE Event Code 5102-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33632721 | ||
June 29, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE Event Code 5102-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33632717 | ||
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Event Code 12030-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 33629310 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 33625133 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 33625132 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Event Code 5583-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33624702 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.