Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sonia Thomas Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Mcalpine Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MICHELLE A BAKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHELLE A BAKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33794381
Date: August 05, 2021WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33734082
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33794381 | ||
July 22, 2021 | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33734082 | ||
July 22, 2021 | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5642-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33733770 | ||
July 22, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 13, 2021 | DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33693157 | ||
July 13, 2021 | F/J FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW Event Code 10635-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 06, 2021 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Event Code 6744-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33661991 | ||
July 06, 2021 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33676989 | ||
June 29, 2021 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33632867 | ||
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | LANDLORD CARES ACT INFO SHEET Event Code 11928-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 33556074 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.