Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shiv Sai Ram Properties Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Any Unknown Tenants, Hooveer Reene, Plante William, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with DAVID E. SILVERMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID E. SILVERMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 18, 2023 | PROOF OF PUBLICATION Event Code 4129-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37064166 | ||
May 17, 2021 | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33444282 | ||
May 11, 2021 | ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33418442 | ||
May 11, 2021 | ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2 | ||
May 11, 2021 | REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 1 | ||
May 06, 2021 | CERTIFICATION OF CLERK REGARDING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Event Code 10322-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33402435 | ||
May 05, 2021 | ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS Event Code 6485-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 33400299 | ||
May 05, 2021 | ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 4 | ||
May 05, 2021 | NOTICE Event Code 6838-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33396146 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.