Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Piper Henry H, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Piper John H, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with JUDITH E ATKIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDITH E ATKIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33032790
Date: February 09, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32984487
Date: January 28, 2021DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33021146
Date: February 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33120847 | ||
February 09, 2021 | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33032790 | ||
February 09, 2021 | FINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 11715-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33032479 | ||
February 09, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | ||
February 05, 2021 | DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33021146 | ||
February 05, 2021 | F/J FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW Event Code 10635-Event Seq 1 | ||
January 28, 2021 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32984487 | ||
January 28, 2021 | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Event Code 2931-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 32984490 | ||
January 28, 2021 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32984480 | ||
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 32909283 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.