Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with MICHELLE A BAKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHELLE A BAKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 32903697
Date: January 11, 2021REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32943728
Date: January 19, 2021REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 32943729
Date: January 19, 2021WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33148938
Date: March 03, 2021WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33088857
Date: February 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33148938 | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33088857 | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5642-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33086833 | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 4 | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS DOCUMENTARY EXHIBIT Event Code 10427-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33070181 | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32943728 | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 32943729 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 32906730 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.