Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID E. SILVERMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID E. SILVERMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 32902972
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33280334
Date: April 07, 2021RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32939143
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33435700 | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33360944 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2 | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33280334 | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2 | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2 | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.