Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Abeles Ronald, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Saracco Michael Anthony, against Gero Carissa Ann, Waser Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID E. SILVERMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID E. SILVERMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33218312
Date: March 17, 2021WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33193761
Date: March 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33193761 | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33218312 | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5642-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33180497 | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Event Code 5583-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32891469 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 32891975 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ASM: EVICTION FILING FEE Event Code 429-Event Seq 4 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS Event Code 9568-Event Seq 5 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 32891974 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.