Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Collins Kenneth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mccarville Ryan, against Holman James, represented by Beamer John D W, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 30968359
Date: September 09, 2019ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30956790
Date: September 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 31961280
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION Event Code 4612-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31361323
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4603-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31054066
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 30968359
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30968358
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30956790
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 30956791
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30915293
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.