Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Johnson, Cole, Johnson, Cole Andrew, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lewis, Annalisse, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/15/2021 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding. | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING 3-15-21 @ 10:30 AM | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY ANNALISSE LEWIS | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ANNISSE LEWIS BY SUBSTITUTE ON 1-19-21 | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ANNALISSE | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M assigned | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 042021DR000020DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/12/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.