Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martin, Aaliyah, Martin, Glorita, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Gambler, Neal Jay, Peacock, Morgan Gabriel, against Bradshaw, Luke, represented by Unice, Thomas Robert, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
|
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 16, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 27, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT LUKE BRADSHAW
Date: May 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO DEFENDANT LUKE BRADSHAW | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 9/9/2021 0100 PM Judge GEORGE WRIGHT results Cancelled on 8/18/2021 | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 9-6-21 | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 9/9/2021 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding. | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing 9-9-21 @ 1:00 PM | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.