Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Olin, Glenn C, Paradise Valley Community Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Dukes, Matthew Aaron, against Fanning, J T, represented by Rabin, Kevin Skyler, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
|
MOTION TO VACATE CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: March 13, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 3/15/2022 1000 AM Judge GEORGE WRIGHT results Cancelled on 3/9/2022 | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 3/15/22 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 3/15/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding. | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing 3/15/22 @ 10:00 AM | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF, ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED RESPONSIVE PLEADING | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | GLENN C OLIN dismissed 11/23/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.