Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Olin, Glenn C, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Dukes, Matthew Aaron, against Bailey, Mary Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
|
SUMMONS ISSUED MARY BAILEY
Date: December 13, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: MARY M BAILEY
Date: December 30, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 13, 2019MTN FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 19, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST MARY BAILEY
Date: February 20, 2020SUMMONS
Date: December 13, 2019LETTER FROM MARY BAILEY
Date: September 03, 2020MTN FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2020Notice Of Hearing AMENDED 6-16-20 @ 1:00 PM
Date: April 13, 2020Notice Of Hearing 4-13-20 @ 3:00 PM
Date: March 06, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 4-13-20
Date: April 13, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EJECTMENT & WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: June 17, 2020ORDER SETTING HEARING (REMOTE) ON 6/16/20 @ 1PM
Date: June 05, 2020LETTER FROM MARY M BAILEY
Date: June 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM MARY BAILEY | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | IMAGE DOCUMENT WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EJECTMENT & WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM MARY M BAILEY | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING (REMOTE) ON 6/16/20 @ 1PM | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing AMENDED 6-16-20 @ 1:00 PM | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 4/13/2020 0300 PM Judge DAVID KREIDER results Cancelled on 4/13/2020 | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 4-13-20 | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/16/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.