Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Olin, Glenn C, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Dukes, Matthew Aaron, against Browning, Virginia, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
|
SUMMONS
Date: December 13, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 13, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED VIRGINIA BROWNING
Date: December 13, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VIRGINIA BROWNING
Date: December 20, 2019ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2020ANSWER FILEDY BY VIRGINIA L BROWNING
Date: December 30, 2019ANSWER FROM VIRGINIA BROWNING
Date: April 13, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 27, 2020Notice Of Hearing 4-13-20 @ 3:10 PM
Date: March 06, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: October 12, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 4-13-20
Date: April 13, 2020Notice Of Hearing AMENDED 6-16-20 @ 1:10 PM
Date: April 13, 2020ORDER SETTING HEARING (REMOTE) ON 6/16/20 @ 1:10PM
Date: June 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING (REMOTE) ON 6/16/20 @ 1:10PM | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER FROM VIRGINIA BROWNING | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 4/13/2020 0310 PM Judge DAVID KREIDER results Cancelled on 4/13/2020 | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 4-13-20 | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/16/2020 at 0110 PM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding. | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing AMENDED 6-16-20 @ 1:10 PM | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/13/2020 at 0310 PM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.