Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Decelle, Carole, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ciesla, Larry Edward, Lester, Jennifer Cates, against Miller, Michael L Ii, represented by Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: September 11, 2020REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) AMENDED
Date: September 29, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SUE PLASTER
Date: December 11, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S)
Date: December 14, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S)
Date: September 28, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: PAUL D NEWELL
Date: December 11, 2020MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENSES AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: September 29, 2020Notice Of Hearing 10-9-20 @ 9:30 AM
Date: October 01, 2020Notice Of Hearing 12-3-20 @ 2:00 PM
Date: November 19, 2020ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12-3-20 @ 2:00 PM
Date: November 18, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VIRGINIA DENNISON OF LAKE AREA TITLE SERVICES
Date: December 29, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ASHLEY RAYMOND C/O CB ISAAC REALTY
Date: December 29, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) DUCES TECUM BY ZOOM
Date: October 28, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ASHLEY RAYMOND
Date: January 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VIRGINIA KENNISON
Date: January 13, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 12, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JESSICAN GENHOLD C/O CBISAAC REALTY
Date: December 29, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) DUCES TECUM AMENDED
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) BY ZOOM
Date: November 19, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: PAUL D NEWELL
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of Filing DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF JEFFREY OODY
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) DUCES TECUM SECOND AMENDED (AS TO ADDITIONAL DEPONENT ONLY)
Date: January 06, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JOEL CALVANI C/O AMERICAN LOCKSITH
Date: January 07, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) DUCES TECUM
Date: December 02, 2020ORDER REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND ORDER ON PTC
Date: January 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: RONALD E BLAKE ALC
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Filing DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF DEFENDANT
Date: January 15, 2021REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S WRITTEN REQUEST TO FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGER AND NOTICE OF FILING SAME
Date: January 21, 2021MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of Filing DRIVERS' LICENSES
Date: January 21, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: RONALD BLAKE
Date: January 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VIRGINIA KENNISON
Date: January 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JESSICA GENHOLD
Date: January 22, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) DUCES TECUM
Date: January 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ASHLEY HAYES RAYMOND
Date: January 22, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 27, 2021MOTION DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SET FOR JANUARY 26, 2021
Date: January 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JESSICA GENHOLD
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE
Date: March 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SUE PLASTER
Date: January 25, 2021Notice Of Hearing 2-17-21 @ 9:00 AM
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE
Date: February 02, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: PAUL D NEWELL
Date: March 17, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JESSICA GENHOLD
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Filing UF HEALTH MEDICAL RECORDS
Date: March 09, 2021Notice Of Hearing 3-23-21 @ 9:30 am
Date: March 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: RONALD E BLAKE ALC
Date: March 10, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: PAUL NEWELL ESQ
Date: March 18, 2021MOTION PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE
Date: March 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: RONALD BLAKE
Date: March 19, 2021ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 6-3-21 @ 1:30 PM
Date: May 10, 2021DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: AMENDED: ATTORNEY LESTER
Date: June 14, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ASHLEY HAYES RAYMOND
Date: March 19, 2021ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL
Date: June 07, 2021ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: May 18, 2021Notice Of Hearing 8-12-21 @10:00 am
Date: June 29, 2021MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: August 26, 2021Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF JENNIFER CATES LESTER AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: September 21, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING 10-1-21 @ 10:00 AM
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF LARRY CIESLA
Date: September 21, 2021LETTER FROM CLERK TO AVERA & SMITH LLP
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE
Date: September 21, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATOIN OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: October 21, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: October 19, 2021RECEIPT
Date: December 16, 2021Notice of Sale 12-16-21
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Filing PROOF OF PUBLICATION 12/16/21
Date: December 06, 2021CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: December 30, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: November 22, 2021FORECLOSURE BID SHEET
Date: December 16, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: December 16, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: December 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number M 13460499 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE BID SHEET | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO PLAINTIFF FOR $500.00 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing PROOF OF PUBLICATION 12/16/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.