Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Us Bank National Association A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kite-Powell, Julia B, Travieso, Jennifer, against Miller, Shawn, Sineath, Betty H, Sineath, Unknown Heirs Etc Of, Sineath, Unknown Spouse Of Bet, Tenant 1, Unknown, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: November 14, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 14, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: November 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS SENT TO ATTORNEY IN PREPAID ENVELOPE PROVIDED | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTOIN TO RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOUCMENTS FROM THE COURT FILE | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSE | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number M 13453985 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS FROM THE COURT FILE | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Reopened for OTHER CIVIL on 6/17/2021 | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: MARY S KNIGHT 5-24-21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.