Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sussman, David Charles, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Dept Of Corrections, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS
Date: November 15, 2019MANDATE FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL OF FLORIDA
Date: July 23, 2021BY ORDER OF THE COURT: DCA CLERK TO PREPARE RECORD WITH 30 DAYS OF DATE OF THIS ORDER
Date: January 29, 2020LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE
Date: November 22, 2019OPINION FILED FROM DCA AFFIRMED
Date: July 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MANDATE FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL OF FLORIDA | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | OPINION FILED FROM DCA AFFIRMED | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | BY ORDER OF THE COURT: DCA CLERK TO PREPARE RECORD WITH 30 DAYS OF DATE OF THIS ORDER | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: KREIDER , DAVID P assigned | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Agency Case Number: DOC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.