Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ross, Shamel J, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Governor Of Florida, Secretary Of Department Of Cor, State Of Florida, Warden,, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS EMERGENCY RELEASE
Date: October 25, 2019LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE
Date: October 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL SHAMEL J ROSS | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING MOTION FOR REHEARING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO FILE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO MIAMI-DADE COUNTY | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR REHEARING WRIT OF MANDAMUS | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSFER TO MIAMI-DADE COUNTY | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CONCLUSION WITH ATTACHMENT | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS EMERGENCY RELEASE | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: KREIDER , DAVID P assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.