Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Henderson, Sergio Winston Arch, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Florida Department Of Correcti, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
LETTER FROM INMATE HENDERSON
Date: November 19, 2019LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE
Date: October 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR REHEARING AND DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FOR PURPOSES OF APPEAL | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSE | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR REHEARING FOR ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FOR PURPOSE OF APPEAL AND/OR ASSISTANCE | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Reopened for OTHER CIVIL on 12/27/2019 | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM INMATE HENDERSON | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: KREIDER , DAVID P assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.