Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Harris, Gregory, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against State Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE
Date: October 16, 2019LETTER FROM CLERK TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 30, 2019NOTICE OF INQUIRY
Date: October 29, 2019MOTION FOR AN SPEEDY TRIAL (UPON DEMAND 3.19(B)
Date: November 01, 2019NOTICE OF INQUIRY
Date: November 25, 2019CERTIFED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT SIGNED
Date: December 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT SIGNED | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | FILE MAILED TO MIAMI-DADE COUNTY CLERK | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INQUIRY | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER TRANSFERRING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR AN SPEEDY TRIAL (UPON DEMAND 3.19(B) | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO PLAINTIFF | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INQUIRY | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Agency Case Number: DOC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.