Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Campus Usa Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Reiss, Jennifer L, against Geiger, Wilma, Huff, Larae R, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
SUMMONS
Date: September 23, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 23, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY REISS
Date: September 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL LARAE R HUFF | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 2/18/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding. | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing 2-18-20 @ 9:30 AM | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing AFFIDAVITS | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.