Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Singletary, Tara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Earle, Steven Edward, against Dingman, Derik Allen, Dingman, Erika Lane, represented by Fields, Franklin Dail, Moran, John Augustine, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS
Date: September 10, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 10, 2019REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ERIKA LANE DINGMAN
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS/TREATING MEDICAL PROVIDER LIST | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) DUCES TECUM | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST DEFENDANTS THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 5/19/2022 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding. | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Event JURY TRIAL scheduled on 6/6/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding. | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY/PRETRIAL PTC 5/19/22 @ 1:00 PM AND JURY TRIAL 6/6/22 @ 9:00 AM | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.