Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Risby, Timothy, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Dukes, Matthew Aaron, against Clark, Lucille, Griffin, Lonnie, Morris, Hilda Belle, Morris, Joe, Risby, Elijah, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Timothy Risby against multiple defendants, including unknown heirs, devisees, grantees, assignees, lienors, creditors, trustees, and any other parties claiming by, through, under, or against various deceased individuals. Th...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 22, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/9/2019 at 0245 PM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding. | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing ON 12/09/19 @ 2:45PM | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | MTN FOR DEFAULT | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - SIGNED (EMAILED TO TELEGRAPH ON 9-13-19) | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.