Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fifth Third Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Adams, Anson Andrew, against Perez, Gustavo, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Fifth Third Bank, an Ohio Banking Corporation, against Gustavo Perez for money owed. The complaint alleges that the defendant failed to pay the outstanding amount due on a credit account between the plaintiff and the defend...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 06, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2019SUMMONS
Date: August 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AS TO GARNISHMENT | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION & REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT CONTINUING FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSE | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONTINUING FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041 (2) | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.