Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Holland, Jesse Jr, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Moreno, Jose Ignacio, against Amrock Inc, Quicken Loans Inc, represented by Knox, Steven Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 18, 2018SUMMONS
Date: December 18, 2018DEFAULT - WITHDRAWN
Date: February 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST QUICKEN LOANS INC | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - WITHDRAWN | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED: AMROCK INC | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | MTN FOR DEFAULT | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED: QUICKEN LOANS INC | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED CLERK'S DEFAULT IN REGARDS TO DEF AMROCK INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.