Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hale, Guy Gregory, against Sandbak, Maria E, Sandbak, Russell C, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: December 05, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 05, 2018MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Filing CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: December 05, 2018VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: December 05, 2018SUMMONS
Date: December 05, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED RUSSELL C SANDBAK AKA RUSSELL SANDBAK
Date: December 19, 2018ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 08, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 05, 2018RETURNED MAIL RUSSELL C SANDBAK
Date: March 25, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED MARIA E SANDBAK
Date: December 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: March 29, 2019RETURNED MAIL MARIA E SANDBAK
Date: March 25, 2019LETTER FROM BROCK & SCOTT PLLC TO CLERK
Date: March 29, 2019NOTICE OF CIVIL ACTION (EMAILED TO TELEGRAPH)
Date: April 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: April 23, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: April 23, 2019NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 06, 2019Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FOR MARIA E SANDBAK
Date: May 06, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL
Date: May 17, 2019MTN FOR DEFAULT
Date: May 14, 2019ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 20, 2019HEARING DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 20, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 23, 2019RETURNED MAIL RUSSELL SANDBAK
Date: May 24, 2019ANSWER FILED BY RUSSELL SANDBAK
Date: June 24, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING
Date: May 21, 2019ANSWER FILED BY MARIA SANDBAK
Date: June 24, 2019RETURNED MAIL MARIA E SANDBAK
Date: May 24, 2019Notice Of Hearing
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Filing PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Filing ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE (EFILED)
Date: August 12, 2019PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL MARIA SANDBAK
Date: September 05, 2019PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL RUSSELL SANDBAK
Date: September 05, 2019Notice of Filing ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE (BOTH ORIGINALS)
Date: August 13, 2019HEARING DISPOSITION FORM
Date: September 05, 2019FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: September 06, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING
Date: September 11, 2019Notice of Sale FOR 11-21-19 (EMAILED TO TELEGRAPH)
Date: September 12, 2019FORECLOSURE BID SHEET
Date: November 21, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE 11-21-19
Date: September 27, 2019RECEIPT
Date: November 21, 2019CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: December 03, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO PLAINTIFF FOR $95,100.00
Date: November 21, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: December 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE BID SHEET | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number M 13433195 | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO PLAINTIFF FOR $95,100.00 | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE 11-21-19 | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Event FORECLOSURE SALE scheduled on 11/21/2019 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.