Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Funding Inc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Cawthon, Henri Chevet, against Nugent, Danny, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with STANLEY GRIFFIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTANLEY GRIFFIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Updated Event STATUS CONFERENCE on 1/23/2017 1035 AM Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS III results Cancelled on 1/25/2017 | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING FILE | |
January 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NTC OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Event STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/23/2017 at 1035 AM, MX - Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS III presiding. | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER GARNISHEE PAYPAL INCS ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AS TO GARNISHMENT | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT TO PAYPAL INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.