Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Johnson, Earl, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Robinson, Glendell, Wca Waste Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: April 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | IMAGE DOCUMENT MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHROITY | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR MEDICAL EXAMINATION | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING CONSENT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION CONSENT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE DEFENDANTS PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.