Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bell, Brian, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Earle, Steven Edward, against Allstate Fire And Casualty Ins, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with PENA, PHILLIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePENA, PHILLIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 5/11/2016 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge PHILLIP PENA presiding. | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CMC STATEMENT | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | IMAGE DOCUMENT RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.