Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Norman, Tina Dianne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sorenson, Charles Anthony, against Jeffers, Joseph Keith, Farelon And Son Logging Inc, represented by Fallin, Sorena Speight, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with PHILLIP PENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePHILLIP PENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | IMAGE DOCUMENT PLF'S RESPONSE TO DEFS' REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing PLAINTIFFS DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL WITNESS | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation CONFERENCE | |
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES | |
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS EXPERT REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS BOECHER INTERROGATORIES REGARDING EXPERTS | |
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS BOECHER EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTOIN OF DOCUMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.