Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Uber Promotions, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Eross, Thomas Michael, against Affordable Rv Repair And Body, Hilton, Virgil F, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Event STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/29/2017 at 0205 PM, MX - Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS III presiding. | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT MEDIATION REPORT | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | IMAGE DOCUMENT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AT MEDIATION | |
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event | IMAGE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 1.720(b) | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST (2ND AMENDED) | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | IMAGE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.