Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Steele, David, Steele, Dewanda, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Davidson, Charles Brian, against Good2Go Roofing And Contracting Llc, represented by Schiffrin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiffs, David and Dewanda Steele, against the Defendant, Good2Go Roofing & Construction, LLC. The Plaintiffs are residents of Panama City, Bay County, Florida, and the Defendant is a for-profit corporation providing...
EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFT
Date: August 27, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- GOOD2GO ROOFING
Date: August 19, 2021EP - ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO ABATE AND COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: February 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO ABATE AND COMPEL ARBITRATION | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 02/15/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN J/ , JDG: HENRY, WILLIAM | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ROYAL SCOTTS LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF DEWANDA STEELES LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTOMY | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF CHAD DUDECK'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF DAVID STEELE'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.