Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Schonbrun, Harvey A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Schonbrun, Harvey A, against Few, Darlene W, Starcorp Llc, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Commercial $250K+ |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Harvey Schonbrun, as Trustee, against the defendant, STARCORP LLC, as Trustee under Golden Pond Land Trust. The complaint is divided into two counts.
Count I is for the foreclosure of a mort...
EP - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2022EP - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: August 18, 2021CORRESPONDENCE FROM H. THERON FEW FOR DARLENE V FEW
Date: July 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : FORECLOSURE SALES SET FOR 09/15/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN ONLINE/ , JDG: FORECLOSURE CLERK : ORDER CANCELLING SALE | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE ON 09/15/22 | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2022037509 | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION TO CANCEL SALE | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL NOTE &/ OR MORTGAGE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.