Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lpt Retail Management Company Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Maddalena, Julia K, against Proxysure Corporation, represented by Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by LPT Retail Management Company, LLC against ProxySure Corporation, also known as ProxySure, Inc. The plaintiff alleges that ProxySure, a Texas corporation, breached its contract and committed professional negligence. LPT Ret...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2021EP - ORDER OF RECUSAL
Date: August 11, 2021EP - ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - PROXYSURE CORP
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - FOURTH AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - 2ND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PTFS AMENDED RESPONSE TO 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PTFS AMENDED RESPONSE TO 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.