Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Whitley, Martha, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Minchin, Jonathan B, against Calypso Towers Resort Community Association Inc, represented by Harney-Hiller, Niva M Esq, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryNegligence Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by Martha Whitley against Calypso Towers Resort Community Association, Inc. The complaint alleges that on August 21, 2020, Martha Whitley rented a vacation unit at the defendant's premises in Panama City Beach, Florida. While ...
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021031319
Date: July 21, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 21, 2021EP - DEFTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA
Date: February 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS MOTION TO COMPEL | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS PRIVILEGE LOG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.