Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Spradlin, Elizabeth L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hobbs, Ryan Blake, against James, Rodney K, Jerry Wilson Roofing Llc, Taylor, Justin G, Usaa General Indemnity Company, represented by Daigle, Meghan Daigle, Rost, Justin Nathaniel, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Elizabeth L. Spradlin against defendants Rodney K. James, Jerry Wilson Roofing, LLC, Justin G. Taylor, and USAA General Indemnity Company. The jurisdiction of the case is in the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Bay Co...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: July 15, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 15, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 06/01/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN JC/ , JDG: SMILEY, ELIJAH | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER SETTING CAUSE FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WITH INSTRUCTIONS ADN ESTABLISHING SUMMARY JUDGMENT TIMELINES AND PROCEDURES | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER SETTING AND ESTABLISHING TIMELINES AD PROCEDURES FOR MOTIONS AND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/12/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: SMILEY, ELIJAH | |
February 12, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS THIRD AMENDED DESIGNATIO OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.