Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Redmon, Edward, Redmon, Kristen, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Janssen, Joseph W Iii, against First Protective Insurance Company, represented by Gutterman, Marc Jason, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 16, 2021EP - MOTION TO EXTEND TIME- DFTS
Date: November 29, 2021EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE APPRAISAL | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EP -DFTS MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND TO COMPEL PLTS IMMEDIATE APPOINTMENT OF APPRAISER | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION TO EXTEND TIME- DFTS | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTY FOR DFT | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER TO ABATE PENDING COMPLETION OF APPRAISAL | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL AND ABATE LITIGATION | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.