Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stagg, Judy B, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Kandell, Scott E, against Gulfstream Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Gilot, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Judy B. Stagg against Gulfstream Property & Casualty Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The complaint alleges that the amount in controversy exceeds $30,000. Judy B. ...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 09, 2021EP- STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 21, 2021EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 24, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS OF ATTY FOR DFT
Date: June 18, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 24, 2021EP - PLT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: July 09, 2021EP - PLT FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 09, 2021EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021014597
Date: April 12, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - GULFSTREAM PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE HENRY, WILLIAM: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION K ASSIGNED | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF REHABILITATION FILING AND IMPOSITION OF AUTOMATIC STAY | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLT FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS OF ATTY FOR DFT | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | EP- STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021014597 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.