Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lane, Delorise, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Gwartney, Scott Edward, against Pcpmg Of Florida Llc, Pinnacle Health Facilities Xxiv Lp, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryNegligence Nursing Home Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The plaintiff, Delorise Lane, is represented by her attorney-in-fact, Crystal McVay. The defendants in this case are Pinnacle Hea...
EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED PINNACLE HEALTH FACILITIES 04/13/21
Date: April 23, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - PCPMG OF FLORIDA LLC
Date: April 09, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER ON DFTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - REPLY TO PLTFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS AMENDED COMPLANINT AND COMPEL ARBITRATION | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLTS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COMPEL ARBITRATION | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 01/31/2022 AT 2:00 PM IN JC/ , JDG: GOODMAN, JAMES J JR | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.